House | 06/23/2015 | Signed by the Governor | ||
House | 06/15/2015 | Transmitted by Secretary of the State to Governor | ||
House | 06/15/2015 | Transmitted to the Secretary of State | ||
House | 06/11/2015 | Special Act 15-12 | ||
House | 06/01/2015 | In Concurrence | ||
House | 06/01/2015 | House Passed | ||
House | 05/30/2015 | House Calendar Number 674 | ||
House | 05/30/2015 | Favorable Report, Tabled for the Calendar, House | ||
House | 05/30/2015 | Rules Suspended, Transmitted to the House | ||
Senate | 05/30/2015 | Senate Passed | ||
Senate | 03/31/2015 | File Number 341 | ||
Senate | 03/31/2015 | Senate Calendar Number 235 | ||
Senate | 03/31/2015 | Favorable Report, Tabled for the Calendar, Senate | ||
Senate | 03/31/2015 | Reported Out of Legislative Commissioners' Office | ||
Senate | 03/24/2015 | Referred to Office of Legislative Research and Office of Fiscal Analysis 03/30/15 5:00 PM | ||
Senate | 03/16/2015 | Filed with Legislative Commissioners' Office | ||
Senate | 03/12/2015 | Joint Favorable | ||
Senate | 02/27/2015 | Public Hearing 03/05 | ||
Senate | 02/20/2015 | Referred to Joint Committee on General Law |