Senate | 04/23/2015 | File Number 737 | ||
Senate | 04/23/2015 | Senate Calendar Number 428 | ||
Senate | 04/23/2015 | Favorable Report, Tabled for the Calendar, Senate | ||
Senate | 04/23/2015 | Reported Out of Legislative Commissioners' Office | ||
Senate | 04/17/2015 | Referred to Office of Legislative Research and Office of Fiscal Analysis 04/22/15 5:00 PM | ||
Senate | 04/07/2015 | Filed with Legislative Commissioners' Office | ||
Senate | 04/06/2015 | Joint Favorable | ||
Senate | 03/02/2015 | Public Hearing 03/06 | ||
Senate | 02/20/2015 | Referred to Joint Committee on Judiciary |