Senate | 04/20/2015 | Motion Failed JF | ||
Senate | 04/14/2015 | Referred by Senate to Committee on Judiciary | ||
Senate | 03/30/2015 | File Number 300 | ||
Senate | 03/30/2015 | Senate Calendar Number 229 | ||
Senate | 03/30/2015 | Favorable Report, Tabled for the Calendar, Senate | ||
Senate | 03/30/2015 | Reported Out of Legislative Commissioners' Office | ||
Senate | 03/23/2015 | Referred to Office of Legislative Research and Office of Fiscal Analysis 03/30/15 10:00 AM | ||
Senate | 03/16/2015 | Filed with Legislative Commissioners' Office | ||
Senate | 03/12/2015 | Joint Favorable | ||
Senate | 02/27/2015 | Public Hearing 03/05 | ||
Senate | 02/23/2015 | Referred to Joint Committee on Labor and Public Employees |