Senate
|
06/05/2015
|
Signed by the Governor
|
|
|
Senate
|
06/01/2015
|
Transmitted by Secretary of the State to Governor
|
|
|
Senate
|
06/01/2015
|
Transmitted to the Secretary of State
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/28/2015
|
Public Act 15-47
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/21/2015
|
In Concurrence
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/21/2015
|
House Passed as Amended by Senate Amendment Schedule A
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/21/2015
|
House Adopted Senate Amendment Schedule A
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/08/2015
|
House Calendar Number 533
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/08/2015
|
Favorable Report, Tabled for the Calendar, House
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/07/2015
|
Senate Passed as Amended by Senate Amendment Schedule A
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/07/2015
|
Senate Adopted Senate Amendment Schedule A 6185
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/26/2015
|
File Number 269
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/26/2015
|
Senate Calendar Number 209
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/26/2015
|
Favorable Report, Tabled for the Calendar, Senate
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/26/2015
|
Reported Out of Legislative Commissioners' Office
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/20/2015
|
Referred to Office of Legislative Research and Office of Fiscal Analysis 03/25/15 5:00 PM
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/16/2015
|
Filed with Legislative Commissioners' Office
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/12/2015
|
Joint Favorable
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/27/2015
|
Public Hearing 03/03
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/23/2015
|
Referred to Joint Committee on Labor and Public Employees
|
|
|