Senate
|
06/05/2015
|
Signed by the Governor
|
|
|
Senate
|
06/02/2015
|
Transmitted by Secretary of the State to Governor
|
|
|
Senate
|
06/02/2015
|
Transmitted to the Secretary of State
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/30/2015
|
Public Act 15-49
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/26/2015
|
In Concurrence
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/26/2015
|
House Passed
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/15/2015
|
House Calendar Number 567
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/15/2015
|
Favorable Report, Tabled for the Calendar, House
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/14/2015
|
On Consent Calendar
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/14/2015
|
Senate Passed
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/06/2015
|
No New File by Committee on Judiciary
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/06/2015
|
Favorable Report, Tabled for the Calendar, Senate
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/05/2015
|
Reported Out of Legislative Commissioners' Office
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/05/2015
|
Filed with Legislative Commissioners' Office
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/05/2015
|
Joint Favorable
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/29/2015
|
Referred by Senate to Committee on Judiciary
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/22/2015
|
No New File by Committee on General Law
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/14/2015
|
Referred by Senate to Committee on General Law
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/07/2015
|
File Number 495
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/07/2015
|
Senate Calendar Number 308
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/30/2015
|
Referred to Office of Legislative Research and Office of Fiscal Analysis 04/07/15 10:00 AM
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/13/2015
|
Public Hearing 03/18
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/24/2015
|
Referred to Joint Committee on Public Health
|
|
|