Senate | 05/19/2015 | Referred by Senate to Committee on Appropriations | ||
Senate | 04/15/2015 | No New File by Committee on Housing | ||
Senate | 04/15/2015 | Favorable Report, Tabled for the Calendar, Senate | ||
Senate | 04/14/2015 | Joint Favorable | ||
Senate | 04/14/2015 | Reported Out of Legislative Commissioners' Office | ||
Senate | 04/14/2015 | Filed with Legislative Commissioners' Office | ||
Senate | 04/08/2015 | Referred by Senate to Committee on Housing | ||
Senate | 03/23/2015 | File Number 158 | ||
Senate | 03/23/2015 | Senate Calendar Number 146 | ||
Senate | 03/16/2015 | Referred to Office of Legislative Research and Office of Fiscal Analysis 03/23/15 10:00 AM | ||
Senate | 03/05/2015 | Joint Favorable Substitute | ||
Senate | 02/26/2015 | Public Hearing 03/03 | ||
Senate | 02/25/2015 | Referred to Joint Committee on Aging |