Senate | 05/19/2015 | Senate Recommitted to Children | ||
Senate | 03/19/2015 | File Number 139 | ||
Senate | 03/19/2015 | Senate Calendar Number 133 | ||
Senate | 03/19/2015 | Favorable Report, Tabled for the Calendar, Senate | ||
Senate | 03/19/2015 | Reported Out of Legislative Commissioners' Office | ||
Senate | 03/13/2015 | Referred to Office of Legislative Research and Office of Fiscal Analysis 03/18/15 5:00 PM | ||
Senate | 03/06/2015 | Filed with Legislative Commissioners' Office | ||
Senate | 03/05/2015 | Joint Favorable | ||
Senate | 02/26/2015 | Public Hearing 03/03 | ||
Senate | 02/25/2015 | Referred to Joint Committee on Children |