Senate | 03/19/2015 | Favorable Change of Reference, House to Committee on Judiciary | ||
Senate | 03/19/2015 | Favorable Change of Reference, Senate to Committee on Judiciary | ||
Senate | 03/18/2015 | Reported Out of Legislative Commissioners' Office | ||
Senate | 03/17/2015 | Filed with Legislative Commissioners' Office | ||
Senate | 03/17/2015 | Joint Favorable Substitute Change of Reference Judiciary | ||
Senate | 02/27/2015 | Public Hearing 03/05 | ||
Senate | 02/25/2015 | Referred to Joint Committee on Human Services |