Senate | 04/13/2015 | Motion Failed JFS | ||
Senate | 04/08/2015 | Referred by Senate to Committee on Public Health | ||
Senate | 04/02/2015 | File Number 447 | ||
Senate | 04/02/2015 | Senate Calendar Number 281 | ||
Senate | 04/02/2015 | Favorable Report, Tabled for the Calendar, Senate | ||
Senate | 04/02/2015 | Reported Out of Legislative Commissioners' Office | ||
Senate | 03/27/2015 | Referred to Office of Legislative Research and Office of Fiscal Analysis 04/01/15 5:00 PM | ||
Senate | 03/19/2015 | Filed with Legislative Commissioners' Office | ||
Senate | 03/19/2015 | Joint Favorable Substitute | ||
Senate | 02/27/2015 | Public Hearing 03/03 | ||
Senate | 02/25/2015 | Referred to Joint Committee on Public Safety and Security |