Senate | 03/31/2015 | File Number 342 | ||
Senate | 03/31/2015 | Senate Calendar Number 242 | ||
Senate | 03/31/2015 | Favorable Report, Tabled for the Calendar, Senate | ||
Senate | 03/31/2015 | Reported Out of Legislative Commissioners' Office | ||
Senate | 03/24/2015 | Referred to Office of Legislative Research and Office of Fiscal Analysis 03/30/15 5:00 PM | ||
Senate | 03/16/2015 | Filed with Legislative Commissioners' Office | ||
Senate | 03/12/2015 | Joint Favorable Substitute | ||
Senate | 02/27/2015 | Public Hearing 03/03 | ||
Senate | 02/25/2015 | Referred to Joint Committee on Public Safety and Security |