Senate | 05/05/2015 | Referred by Senate to Committee on Finance, Revenue and Bonding | ||
Senate | 04/07/2015 | File Number 496 | ||
Senate | 04/07/2015 | Senate Calendar Number 289 | ||
Senate | 04/07/2015 | Favorable Report, Tabled for the Calendar, Senate | ||
Senate | 04/07/2015 | Reported Out of Legislative Commissioners' Office | ||
Senate | 03/30/2015 | Referred to Office of Legislative Research and Office of Fiscal Analysis 04/07/15 10:00 AM | ||
Senate | 03/20/2015 | Filed with Legislative Commissioners' Office | ||
Senate | 03/19/2015 | Joint Favorable Substitute | ||
Senate | 02/27/2015 | Public Hearing 03/03 | ||
Senate | 02/26/2015 | Referred to Joint Committee on Commerce |