Senate | 03/16/2015 | Favorable Change of Reference, House to Committee on Appropriations | ||
Senate | 03/16/2015 | Favorable Change of Reference, Senate to Committee on Appropriations | ||
Senate | 03/13/2015 | Reported Out of Legislative Commissioners' Office | ||
Senate | 03/13/2015 | Filed with Legislative Commissioners' Office | ||
Senate | 03/12/2015 | Joint Favorable Substitute Change of Reference Appropriations | ||
Senate | 02/27/2015 | Public Hearing 03/05 | ||
Senate | 02/26/2015 | Referred to Joint Committee on General Law |