Senate | 05/22/2015 | House Calendar Number 623 | ||
Senate | 05/22/2015 | Favorable Report, Tabled for the Calendar, House | ||
Senate | 05/20/2015 | On Consent Calendar | ||
Senate | 05/20/2015 | Senate Passed | ||
Senate | 03/26/2015 | File Number 272 | ||
Senate | 03/26/2015 | Senate Calendar Number 195 | ||
Senate | 03/26/2015 | Favorable Report, Tabled for the Calendar, Senate | ||
Senate | 03/26/2015 | Reported Out of Legislative Commissioners' Office | ||
Senate | 03/20/2015 | Referred to Office of Legislative Research and Office of Fiscal Analysis 03/25/15 5:00 PM | ||
Senate | 03/10/2015 | Filed with Legislative Commissioners' Office | ||
Senate | 03/10/2015 | Joint Favorable Substitute | ||
Senate | 02/27/2015 | Public Hearing 03/05 | ||
Senate | 02/26/2015 | Referred to Joint Committee on Insurance and Real Estate |