Senate | 05/08/2015 | House Calendar Number 534 | ||
Senate | 05/08/2015 | Favorable Report, Tabled for the Calendar, House | ||
Senate | 05/07/2015 | On Consent Calendar | ||
Senate | 05/07/2015 | Senate Passed as Amended by Senate Amendment Schedule A | ||
Senate | 05/07/2015 | Senate Adopted Senate Amendment Schedule A 6904 | ||
Senate | 04/15/2015 | File Number 660 | ||
Senate | 04/15/2015 | Senate Calendar Number 373 | ||
Senate | 04/15/2015 | Favorable Report, Tabled for the Calendar, Senate | ||
Senate | 04/15/2015 | Reported Out of Legislative Commissioners' Office | ||
Senate | 04/09/2015 | Referred to Office of Legislative Research and Office of Fiscal Analysis 04/14/15 5:00 PM | ||
Senate | 03/30/2015 | Filed with Legislative Commissioners' Office | ||
Senate | 03/27/2015 | Joint Favorable | ||
Senate | 03/09/2015 | Public Hearing 03/13 | ||
Senate | 02/26/2015 | Referred to Joint Committee on Judiciary |