Senate | 05/30/2015 | House Calendar Number 676 | ||
Senate | 05/30/2015 | Favorable Report, Tabled for the Calendar, House | ||
Senate | 05/29/2015 | Senate Passed as Amended by Senate Amendment Schedule A,B | ||
Senate | 05/29/2015 | Senate Adopted Senate Amendment Schedule B 8614 | ||
Senate | 05/19/2015 | No New File by Committee on Government Administration and Elections | ||
Senate | 05/19/2015 | Favorable Report, Tabled for the Calendar, Senate | ||
Senate | 05/19/2015 | Reported Out of Legislative Commissioners' Office | ||
Senate | 05/19/2015 | Filed with Legislative Commissioners' Office | ||
Senate | 05/19/2015 | Joint Favorable | ||
Senate | 05/14/2015 | Referred by Senate to Committee on Government Administration and Elections | ||
Senate | 05/14/2015 | Senate Adopted Senate Amendment Schedule A 6227 | ||
Senate | 03/26/2015 | File Number 274 | ||
Senate | 03/26/2015 | Senate Calendar Number 211 | ||
Senate | 03/20/2015 | Referred to Office of Legislative Research and Office of Fiscal Analysis 03/25/15 5:00 PM | ||
Senate | 02/27/2015 | Public Hearing 03/05 | ||
Senate | 02/26/2015 | Referred to Joint Committee on Labor and Public Employees |