Senate
|
06/23/2015
|
Signed by the Governor
|
|
|
Senate
|
06/11/2015
|
Transmitted by Secretary of the State to Governor
|
|
|
Senate
|
06/11/2015
|
Transmitted to the Secretary of State
|
|
|
Senate
|
06/08/2015
|
Public Act 15-95
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/27/2015
|
In Concurrence
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/27/2015
|
House Passed as Amended by Senate Amendment Schedule A
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/27/2015
|
House Adopted Senate Amendment Schedule A
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/22/2015
|
House Calendar Number 624
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/22/2015
|
Favorable Report, Tabled for the Calendar, House
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/20/2015
|
Senate Passed as Amended by Senate Amendment Schedule A
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/20/2015
|
Senate Adopted Senate Amendment Schedule A 7349
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/15/2015
|
File Number 661
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/15/2015
|
Senate Calendar Number 376
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/15/2015
|
Favorable Report, Tabled for the Calendar, Senate
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/15/2015
|
Reported Out of Legislative Commissioners' Office
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/09/2015
|
Referred to Office of Legislative Research and Office of Fiscal Analysis 04/14/15 5:00 PM
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/30/2015
|
Filed with Legislative Commissioners' Office
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/27/2015
|
Joint Favorable
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/02/2015
|
Public Hearing 03/06
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/27/2015
|
Referred to Joint Committee on Planning and Development
|
|
|