Senate | 06/02/2015 | Senate Recommitted to Planning and Development | ||
Senate | 06/01/2015 | Moved to Foot of the Calendar, Senate | ||
Senate | 04/21/2015 | No New File by Committee on Government Administration and Elections | ||
Senate | 04/21/2015 | Favorable Report, Tabled for the Calendar, Senate | ||
Senate | 04/21/2015 | Reported Out of Legislative Commissioners' Office | ||
Senate | 04/21/2015 | Filed with Legislative Commissioners' Office | ||
Senate | 04/20/2015 | Joint Favorable | ||
Senate | 04/14/2015 | Referred by Senate to Committee on Government Administration and Elections | ||
Senate | 04/08/2015 | File Number 556 | ||
Senate | 04/08/2015 | Senate Calendar Number 327 | ||
Senate | 04/01/2015 | Referred to Office of Legislative Research and Office of Fiscal Analysis 04/07/15 5:00 PM | ||
Senate | 03/20/2015 | Joint Favorable Substitute | ||
Senate | 03/06/2015 | Public Hearing 03/11 | ||
Senate | 03/02/2015 | Referred to Joint Committee on Planning and Development |