Senate | 04/13/2015 | File Number 615 | ||
Senate | 04/13/2015 | Senate Calendar Number 344 | ||
Senate | 04/13/2015 | Favorable Report, Tabled for the Calendar, Senate | ||
Senate | 04/13/2015 | Reported Out of Legislative Commissioners' Office | ||
Senate | 04/06/2015 | Referred to Office of Legislative Research and Office of Fiscal Analysis 04/13/15 10:00 AM | ||
Senate | 03/25/2015 | Filed with Legislative Commissioners' Office | ||
Senate | 03/24/2015 | Joint Favorable | ||
Senate | 03/13/2015 | Public Hearing 03/17 | ||
Senate | 03/04/2015 | Referred to Joint Committee on Energy and Technology |