Senate | 05/21/2015 | House Calendar Number 599 | ||
Senate | 05/21/2015 | Favorable Report, Tabled for the Calendar, House | ||
Senate | 05/19/2015 | On Consent Calendar | ||
Senate | 05/19/2015 | Senate Passed | ||
Senate | 04/30/2015 | No New File by Committee on Planning and Development | ||
Senate | 04/30/2015 | Favorable Report, Tabled for the Calendar, Senate | ||
Senate | 04/29/2015 | Reported Out of Legislative Commissioners' Office | ||
Senate | 04/29/2015 | Filed with Legislative Commissioners' Office | ||
Senate | 04/28/2015 | Joint Favorable | ||
Senate | 04/22/2015 | Referred by Senate to Committee on Planning and Development | ||
Senate | 04/07/2015 | File Number 499 | ||
Senate | 04/07/2015 | Senate Calendar Number 292 | ||
Senate | 03/30/2015 | Referred to Office of Legislative Research and Office of Fiscal Analysis 04/07/15 10:00 AM | ||
Senate | 03/18/2015 | Joint Favorable Substitute | ||
Senate | 03/06/2015 | Public Hearing 03/11 | ||
Senate | 03/05/2015 | Referred to Joint Committee on Education |