Senate
|
06/30/2015
|
Vetoed by the Governor
|
|
|
Senate
|
06/15/2015
|
Transmitted by Secretary of the State to Governor
|
|
|
Senate
|
06/15/2015
|
Transmitted to the Secretary of State
|
|
|
Senate
|
06/11/2015
|
Public Act 15-145
|
|
|
Senate
|
06/01/2015
|
In Concurrence
|
|
|
Senate
|
06/01/2015
|
House Passed
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/21/2015
|
House Calendar Number 600
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/21/2015
|
Favorable Report, Tabled for the Calendar, House
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/19/2015
|
On Consent Calendar
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/19/2015
|
Senate Passed
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/13/2015
|
File Number 816
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/13/2015
|
Senate Calendar Number 496
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/13/2015
|
Favorable Report, Tabled for the Calendar, Senate
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/13/2015
|
Reported Out of Legislative Commissioners' Office
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/07/2015
|
Referred to Office of Legislative Research and Office of Fiscal Analysis 05/12/15 5:00 PM
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/30/2015
|
Filed with Legislative Commissioners' Office
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/29/2015
|
Joint Favorable Substitute
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/25/2015
|
Favorable Change of Reference, House to Committee on Appropriations
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/25/2015
|
Favorable Change of Reference, Senate to Committee on Appropriations
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/18/2015
|
Joint Favorable Substitute Change of Reference Appropriations
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/06/2015
|
Public Hearing 03/11
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/05/2015
|
Referred to Joint Committee on Education
|
|
|