General Assembly Substitute Bill No. 1056 January Session, 2015 *_____SB01056ED_APP032015____* General Assembly Substitute Bill No. 1056 January Session, 2015 *_____SB01056ED_APP032015____* AN ACT CONCERNING THE EXCESS COST THRESHOLD AND THE COLLECTION AND REPORTING OF DATA RELATING TO SPECIAL EDUCATION EXPENDITURES. Be it enacted by the Senate and House of Representatives in General Assembly convened: Section 1. Subsection (b) of section 10-76g of the general statutes is repealed and the following is substituted in lieu thereof (Effective July 1, 2015): (b) Any local or regional board of education which provides special education pursuant to the provisions of this section and sections 10-76a to [10-76g] 10-76f, inclusive, for any exceptional child described in subparagraph (A) of subdivision (5) of section 10-76a, under its jurisdiction, excluding (1) children placed by a state agency for whom a board of education receives payment pursuant to the provisions of subdivision (2) of subsection (e) of section 10-76d, and (2) children who require special education, who reside on state-owned or leased property, and who are not the educational responsibility of the unified school districts established pursuant to sections 17a-37 and 18-99a, shall be financially responsible for the reasonable costs of special education instruction, as defined in the regulations of the State Board of Education, in an amount equal to (A) for any fiscal year [commencing] ending prior to [July 1, 2005] June 30, 2006, five times the average per pupil educational costs of such board of education for the prior fiscal year, determined in accordance with the provisions of subsection (a) of section 10-76f, [and] (B) for the fiscal [year commencing July 1, 2005, and each fiscal year thereafter] years ending June 30, 2006, to June 30, 2017, inclusive, four and one-half times such average per pupil educational costs of such board of education, (C) for the fiscal year ending June 30, 2018, the net current expenditures per resident student multiplied by three and one-half, (D) for the fiscal year ending June 30, 2019, the net current expenditures per resident student multiplied by three, (E) for the fiscal year ending June 30, 2020, the net current expenditures per resident student multiplied by two and one-half, and (F) for the fiscal year ending June 30, 2021, the net current expenditures per resident student multiplied by two. For purposes of this subsection, "net current expenditures per resident student" means the quotient obtained by dividing the net current expenditures, as defined in section 10-261, of such local or regional board of education for the prior fiscal year by the number of resident students, as defined in section 10-262f, of such local or regional board of education. The State Board of Education shall pay on a current basis any costs in excess of the local or regional board's basic contribution paid by such board in accordance with the provisions of this subsection. Any amounts paid by the State Board of Education on a current basis pursuant to this subsection shall not be reimbursable in the subsequent year. Application for such grant shall be made by filing with the Department of Education, in such manner as prescribed by the commissioner, annually on or before December first a statement of the cost of providing special education pursuant to this subsection, provided a board of education may submit, not later than March first, claims for additional children or costs not included in the December filing. Payment by the state for such excess costs shall be made to the local or regional board of education as follows: Seventy-five per cent of the cost in February and the balance in May. The amount due each town pursuant to the provisions of this subsection shall be paid to the treasurer of each town entitled to such aid, provided the treasurer shall treat such grant, or a portion of the grant, which relates to special education expenditures incurred in excess of such town's board of education budgeted estimate of such expenditures, as a reduction in expenditures by crediting such expenditure account, rather than town revenue. Such expenditure account shall be so credited no later than thirty days after receipt by the treasurer of necessary documentation from the board of education indicating the amount of such special education expenditures incurred in excess of such town's board of education budgeted estimate of such expenditures. Sec. 2. (NEW) (Effective July 1, 2015) On or before July 1, 2016, and annually thereafter, each local and regional board of education shall submit a report on its expenditures for special education for the prior fiscal year to the Department of Education. Such report shall include, but need not be limited to, (1) total expenditures for special education of the board of education, (2) expenditures for special education as a percentage of total school district expenditures, and (3) individual expenditures for each child requiring special education who is under the jurisdiction of the board of education. Such report shall not be a public record, as defined in section 1-200, except that nothing in this section shall be construed to prevent the disclosure of information that is included in the strategic school profile under subsection (c) of section 10-220 of the general statutes. Sec. 3. (NEW) (Effective July 1, 2015) On or before October first annually, the Department of Education shall submit a report on disaggregated data relating to the expenditures for special education by local and regional boards of education for the prior fiscal year, collected pursuant to section 2 of this act, to the joint standing committee of the General Assembly having cognizance of matters relating to education, in accordance with the provisions of section 11-4a of the general statutes. Such report shall include, but need not be limited to, a breakdown of the total number of students requiring special education in each school district whose per pupil educational cost for such school district is (1) two times the net current expenditures per resident student of such school district, (2) two and one-half times the net current expenditures per resident student of such school district, (3) three time the net current expenditures per resident student of such school district, (4) three and one-half times the net current expenditures per resident student of such school district, (5) four times the net current expenditures per resident student of such school district, and (6) four and one-half times the net current expenditures per resident student of such school district. For purposes of this section, "net current expenditures per resident student" has the same meaning as provided in subsection (b) of section 10-76g of the general statutes, as amended by this act. This act shall take effect as follows and shall amend the following sections: Section 1 July 1, 2015 10-76g(b) Sec. 2 July 1, 2015 New section Sec. 3 July 1, 2015 New section This act shall take effect as follows and shall amend the following sections: Section 1 July 1, 2015 10-76g(b) Sec. 2 July 1, 2015 New section Sec. 3 July 1, 2015 New section ED Joint Favorable Subst. C/R APP ED Joint Favorable Subst. C/R APP