Senate
|
06/30/2015
|
Signed by the Governor
|
|
|
Senate
|
06/24/2015
|
Transmitted by Secretary of the State to Governor
|
|
|
Senate
|
06/24/2015
|
Transmitted to the Secretary of State
|
|
|
Senate
|
06/17/2015
|
Public Act 15-237
|
|
|
Senate
|
06/02/2015
|
In Concurrence
|
|
|
Senate
|
06/02/2015
|
House Passed as Amended by Senate Amendment Schedule A
|
|
|
Senate
|
06/02/2015
|
House Adopted Senate Amendment Schedule A
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/15/2015
|
House Calendar Number 573
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/15/2015
|
Favorable Report, Tabled for the Calendar, House
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/14/2015
|
Senate Passed as Amended by Senate Amendment Schedule A
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/14/2015
|
Senate Adopted Senate Amendment Schedule A 7027
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/07/2015
|
File Number 502
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/07/2015
|
Senate Calendar Number 295
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/07/2015
|
Favorable Report, Tabled for the Calendar, Senate
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/07/2015
|
Reported Out of Legislative Commissioners' Office
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/30/2015
|
Referred to Office of Legislative Research and Office of Fiscal Analysis 04/07/15 10:00 AM
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/20/2015
|
Filed with Legislative Commissioners' Office
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/18/2015
|
Joint Favorable Substitute
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/06/2015
|
Public Hearing 03/11
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/05/2015
|
Referred to Joint Committee on Education
|
|
|