Senate
|
06/23/2015
|
Signed by the Governor
|
|
|
Senate
|
06/11/2015
|
Transmitted by Secretary of the State to Governor
|
|
|
Senate
|
06/11/2015
|
Transmitted to the Secretary of State
|
|
|
Senate
|
06/09/2015
|
Public Act 15-106
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/29/2015
|
In Concurrence
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/29/2015
|
House Passed as Amended by Senate Amendment Schedule A
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/29/2015
|
House Rejected House Amendment Schedule A 8519
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/29/2015
|
House Adopted Senate Amendment Schedule A
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/28/2015
|
Bill Passed Temporarily
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/22/2015
|
House Calendar Number 625
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/22/2015
|
Favorable Report, Tabled for the Calendar, House
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/20/2015
|
On Consent Calendar
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/20/2015
|
Senate Passed as Amended by Senate Amendment Schedule A
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/20/2015
|
Senate Adopted Senate Amendment Schedule A 7835
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/13/2015
|
No New File by Committee on Appropriations
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/13/2015
|
Favorable Report, Tabled for the Calendar, Senate
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/12/2015
|
Reported Out of Legislative Commissioners' Office
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/12/2015
|
Filed with Legislative Commissioners' Office
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/11/2015
|
Joint Favorable
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/05/2015
|
Referred by Senate to Committee on Appropriations
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/21/2015
|
No New File by Committee on Transportation
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/14/2015
|
Referred by Senate to Committee on Transportation
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/08/2015
|
File Number 557
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/08/2015
|
Senate Calendar Number 314
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/01/2015
|
Referred to Office of Legislative Research and Office of Fiscal Analysis 04/07/15 5:00 PM
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/20/2015
|
Joint Favorable Substitute
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/06/2015
|
Public Hearing 03/11
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/05/2015
|
Referred to Joint Committee on Environment
|
|
|