Senate | 07/02/2015 | Signed by the Governor | ||
Senate | 06/18/2015 | Transmitted by Secretary of the State to Governor | ||
Senate | 06/18/2015 | Transmitted to the Secretary of State | ||
Senate | 06/16/2015 | Public Act 15-190 | ||
Senate | 06/02/2015 | In Concurrence | ||
Senate | 06/02/2015 | House Passed | ||
Senate | 05/15/2015 | House Calendar Number 574 | ||
Senate | 05/15/2015 | Favorable Report, Tabled for the Calendar, House | ||
Senate | 05/14/2015 | On Consent Calendar | ||
Senate | 05/14/2015 | Senate Passed | ||
Senate | 04/08/2015 | File Number 558 | ||
Senate | 04/08/2015 | Senate Calendar Number 315 | ||
Senate | 04/08/2015 | Favorable Report, Tabled for the Calendar, Senate | ||
Senate | 04/08/2015 | Reported Out of Legislative Commissioners' Office | ||
Senate | 04/01/2015 | Referred to Office of Legislative Research and Office of Fiscal Analysis 04/07/15 5:00 PM | ||
Senate | 03/23/2015 | Filed with Legislative Commissioners' Office | ||
Senate | 03/20/2015 | Joint Favorable | ||
Senate | 03/06/2015 | Public Hearing 03/11 | ||
Senate | 03/05/2015 | Referred to Joint Committee on Environment |