Senate | 06/02/2015 | Senate Recommitted to Environment | ||
Senate | 05/27/2015 | Moved to Foot of the Calendar, Senate | ||
Senate | 05/05/2015 | File Number 765 | ||
Senate | 05/05/2015 | New File by Committee on Planning and Development | ||
Senate | 05/05/2015 | Favorable Report, Tabled for the Calendar, Senate | ||
Senate | 05/05/2015 | Reported Out of Legislative Commissioners' Office | ||
Senate | 04/28/2015 | Referred to Office of Legislative Research and Office of Fiscal Analysis 05/04/15 5:00 PM | ||
Senate | 04/21/2015 | Filed with Legislative Commissioners' Office | ||
Senate | 04/20/2015 | Joint Favorable Substitute | ||
Senate | 04/14/2015 | Referred by Senate to Committee on Planning and Development | ||
Senate | 04/08/2015 | File Number 559 | ||
Senate | 04/08/2015 | Senate Calendar Number 316 | ||
Senate | 04/01/2015 | Referred to Office of Legislative Research and Office of Fiscal Analysis 04/07/15 5:00 PM | ||
Senate | 03/06/2015 | Public Hearing 03/11 | ||
Senate | 03/05/2015 | Referred to Joint Committee on Environment |