Senate | 05/27/2015 | No New File by Committee on General Law | ||
Senate | 05/27/2015 | Favorable Report, Tabled for the Calendar, Senate | ||
Senate | 05/27/2015 | Reported Out of Legislative Commissioners' Office | ||
Senate | 05/26/2015 | Joint Favorable | ||
Senate | 05/26/2015 | Filed with Legislative Commissioners' Office | ||
Senate | 05/20/2015 | Referred by Senate to Committee on General Law | ||
Senate | 05/20/2015 | Senate Adopted Senate Amendment Schedule A 7787 | ||
Senate | 04/23/2015 | File Number 739 | ||
Senate | 04/23/2015 | Senate Calendar Number 430 | ||
Senate | 04/17/2015 | Referred to Office of Legislative Research and Office of Fiscal Analysis 04/22/15 5:00 PM | ||
Senate | 04/06/2015 | Joint Favorable Substitute | ||
Senate | 03/09/2015 | Public Hearing 03/13 | ||
Senate | 03/05/2015 | Referred to Joint Committee on Judiciary |