Senate | 05/19/2015 | Removed from the Foot of the Calendar, Senate | ||
Senate | 04/14/2015 | Moved to Foot of the Calendar, Senate | ||
Senate | 04/07/2015 | File Number 505 | ||
Senate | 04/07/2015 | Senate Calendar Number 298 | ||
Senate | 04/07/2015 | Favorable Report, Tabled for the Calendar, Senate | ||
Senate | 04/07/2015 | Reported Out of Legislative Commissioners' Office | ||
Senate | 03/30/2015 | Referred to Office of Legislative Research and Office of Fiscal Analysis 04/07/15 10:00 AM | ||
Senate | 03/25/2015 | Filed with Legislative Commissioners' Office | ||
Senate | 03/24/2015 | Joint Favorable | ||
Senate | 03/13/2015 | Public Hearing 03/17 | ||
Senate | 03/06/2015 | Referred to Joint Committee on Energy and Technology |