House
|
06/19/2015
|
Signed by the Governor
|
|
|
House
|
06/11/2015
|
Transmitted by Secretary of the State to Governor
|
|
|
House
|
06/11/2015
|
Transmitted to the Secretary of State
|
|
|
House
|
06/09/2015
|
Public Act 15-107
|
|
|
House
|
05/29/2015
|
In Concurrence
|
|
|
House
|
05/29/2015
|
House Passed as Amended by Senate Amendment Schedule A
|
|
|
House
|
05/29/2015
|
House Adopted Senate Amendment Schedule A
|
|
|
House
|
05/29/2015
|
Rules Suspended
|
|
|
House
|
05/27/2015
|
House Calendar Number 642
|
|
|
House
|
05/27/2015
|
Favorable Report, Tabled for the Calendar, House
|
|
|
House
|
05/27/2015
|
Rules Suspended, Transmitted to the House
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/27/2015
|
Senate Passed as Amended by Senate Amendment Schedule A
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/27/2015
|
Senate Adopted Senate Amendment Schedule A 8254
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/13/2015
|
File Number 616
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/13/2015
|
Senate Calendar Number 345
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/13/2015
|
Favorable Report, Tabled for the Calendar, Senate
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/13/2015
|
Reported Out of Legislative Commissioners' Office
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/06/2015
|
Referred to Office of Legislative Research and Office of Fiscal Analysis 04/13/15 10:00 AM
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/25/2015
|
Filed with Legislative Commissioners' Office
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/24/2015
|
Joint Favorable Substitute
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/13/2015
|
Public Hearing 03/17
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/09/2015
|
Referred to Joint Committee on Energy and Technology
|
|
|