Senate | 05/22/2015 | No New File by Committee on Judiciary | ||
Senate | 05/22/2015 | Favorable Report, Tabled for the Calendar, Senate | ||
Senate | 05/22/2015 | Reported Out of Legislative Commissioners' Office | ||
Senate | 05/22/2015 | Filed with Legislative Commissioners' Office | ||
Senate | 05/21/2015 | Joint Favorable | ||
Senate | 05/14/2015 | Referred by Senate to Committee on Judiciary | ||
Senate | 04/28/2015 | File Number 752 | ||
Senate | 04/28/2015 | Senate Calendar Number 443 | ||
Senate | 04/21/2015 | Referred to Office of Legislative Research and Office of Fiscal Analysis 04/27/15 5:00 PM | ||
Senate | 04/16/2015 | Joint Favorable Substitute | ||
Senate | 03/13/2015 | Public Hearing 03/18 | ||
Senate | 03/11/2015 | Referred to Joint Committee on Finance, Revenue and Bonding |