Senate
|
06/19/2015
|
Signed by the Governor
|
|
|
Senate
|
06/10/2015
|
Transmitted by Secretary of the State to Governor
|
|
|
Senate
|
06/10/2015
|
Transmitted to the Secretary of State
|
|
|
Senate
|
06/02/2015
|
Public Act 15-61
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/27/2015
|
In Concurrence
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/27/2015
|
Senate Passed as Amended by House Amendment Schedule A
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/27/2015
|
Senate Adopted House Amendment Schedule A
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/27/2015
|
Senate Rejected Senate Amendment Schedule A 8275
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/27/2015
|
Rules Suspended
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/22/2015
|
File Number 886
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/22/2015
|
Disagreeing Action, Tabled for Calendar, Senate
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/20/2015
|
House Passed as Amended by House Amendment Schedule A
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/20/2015
|
House Adopted House Amendment Schedule A 7129
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/24/2015
|
House Calendar Number 489
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/24/2015
|
Favorable Report, Tabled for the Calendar, House
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/22/2015
|
Senate Passed
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/13/2015
|
File Number 617
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/13/2015
|
Senate Calendar Number 351
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/13/2015
|
Favorable Report, Tabled for the Calendar, Senate
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/13/2015
|
Reported Out of Legislative Commissioners' Office
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/06/2015
|
Referred to Office of Legislative Research and Office of Fiscal Analysis 04/13/15 10:00 AM
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/26/2015
|
Filed with Legislative Commissioners' Office
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/25/2015
|
Joint Favorable Substitute
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/12/2015
|
Public Hearing 03/16
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/11/2015
|
Referred to Joint Committee on Government Administration and Elections
|
|
|