Senate | 05/29/2015 | House Calendar Number 655 | ||
Senate | 05/29/2015 | Favorable Report, Tabled for the Calendar, House | ||
Senate | 05/27/2015 | Senate Passed as Amended by Senate Amendment Schedule A | ||
Senate | 05/27/2015 | Senate Adopted Senate Amendment Schedule A 7910 | ||
Senate | 04/13/2015 | File Number 618 | ||
Senate | 04/13/2015 | Senate Calendar Number 352 | ||
Senate | 04/13/2015 | Favorable Report, Tabled for the Calendar, Senate | ||
Senate | 04/13/2015 | Reported Out of Legislative Commissioners' Office | ||
Senate | 04/06/2015 | Referred to Office of Legislative Research and Office of Fiscal Analysis 04/13/15 10:00 AM | ||
Senate | 03/26/2015 | Filed with Legislative Commissioners' Office | ||
Senate | 03/26/2015 | Joint Favorable Substitute | ||
Senate | 03/12/2015 | Public Hearing 03/16 | ||
Senate | 03/11/2015 | Referred to Joint Committee on Government Administration and Elections |