Connecticut 2015 Regular Session

Connecticut Senate Bill SB01084 Compare Versions

Only one version of the bill is available at this time.
OldNewDifferences
11 General Assembly Raised Bill No. 1084
22 January Session, 2015 LCO No. 5135
33 *05135_______HED*
44 Referred to Committee on HIGHER EDUCATION AND EMPLOYMENT ADVANCEMENT
55 Introduced by:
66 (HED)
77
88 General Assembly
99
1010 Raised Bill No. 1084
1111
1212 January Session, 2015
1313
1414 LCO No. 5135
1515
1616 *05135_______HED*
1717
1818 Referred to Committee on HIGHER EDUCATION AND EMPLOYMENT ADVANCEMENT
1919
2020 Introduced by:
2121
2222 (HED)
2323
2424 AN ACT CONCERNING CERTIFICATE PROGRAMS AT THE REGIONAL COMMUNITY-TECHNICAL COLLEGES.
2525
2626 Be it enacted by the Senate and House of Representatives in General Assembly convened:
2727
2828 Section 1. (NEW) (Effective July 1, 2015) As used in this section and sections 2 and 3 of this act:
2929
3030 (1) "Institution of higher education" has the same meaning as provided in section 10a-34 of the general statutes; and
3131
3232 (2) "Private occupational school" has the same meaning as provided in section 10a-22a of the general statutes and includes, but is not limited to, hospital-based occupational schools, barber schools and hairdressing schools authorized pursuant to section 10a-22b of the general statutes.
3333
3434 Sec. 2. (Effective July 1, 2015) The Board of Regents for Higher Education, in collaboration with the Office of Higher Education, shall develop a written definition for all sub-baccalaureate certificates awarded by an institution of higher education or private occupational school in the state for the purpose of creating consistency among the various sub-baccalaureate certificate programs. Not later than January 1, 2016, the president of the Board of Regents for Higher Education shall submit, in accordance with the provisions of section 11-4a of the general statutes, a report containing such written definition to the joint standing committee of the General Assembly having cognizance of matters relating to higher education.
3535
3636 Sec. 3. (NEW) (Effective July 1, 2015) (a) Not later than July 1, 2016, and annually thereafter, each institution of higher education and private occupational school in the state shall provide data for the prior academic year to the Office of Higher Education regarding its sub-baccalaureate certificate programs and the types of sub-baccalaureate certificates it offers in a uniform format developed by said office. Such data shall include, but not be limited to, the following for each sub-baccalaureate certificate program:
3737
3838 (1) Name and subject matter area of such program;
3939
4040 (2) Total enrollment in such program;
4141
4242 (3) Any entry-level requirements for enrollment in such program;
4343
4444 (4) Number and type of certificate awarded by such program;
4545
4646 (5) Whether academic credits are offered as part of such program;
4747
4848 (6) Whether there is a clear pathway from successful completion of such program to enrollment in a related associate degree program;
4949
5050 (7) Whether such program leads to an industry-recognized credential;
5151
5252 (8) Whether a student can combine the certificate awarded upon successful completion of such program with any other certificate awarded upon the successful completion of another sub-baccalaureate certificate program in order to achieve a heightened level of qualification for a particular trade or occupation; and
5353
5454 (9) Average length of time to complete such program.
5555
5656 (b) Not later than January 1, 2017, and annually thereafter, the Office of Higher Education shall compile such data for purposes of comparing the various types of sub-baccalaureate programs offered by the institutions of higher education and private occupational schools and determining (1) which programs are similar, (2) student interest in each program and similar programs, and (3) the necessity of offering each program. Not later than July 1, 2017, and annually thereafter, said office shall make such data available on its Internet web site for the purpose of enabling a student or prospective student to make an informed decision about whether to enroll in a sub-baccalaureate program and, if so, which program is the best fit for such student.
5757
5858
5959
6060
6161 This act shall take effect as follows and shall amend the following sections:
6262 Section 1 July 1, 2015 New section
6363 Sec. 2 July 1, 2015 New section
6464 Sec. 3 July 1, 2015 New section
6565
6666 This act shall take effect as follows and shall amend the following sections:
6767
6868 Section 1
6969
7070 July 1, 2015
7171
7272 New section
7373
7474 Sec. 2
7575
7676 July 1, 2015
7777
7878 New section
7979
8080 Sec. 3
8181
8282 July 1, 2015
8383
8484 New section
8585
8686 Statement of Purpose:
8787
8888 To require a compilation of data about each sub-baccalaureate program in the state and enable students and prospective students to make an informed decision about whether to enroll in a particular program.
8989
9090 [Proposed deletions are enclosed in brackets. Proposed additions are indicated by underline, except that when the entire text of a bill or resolution or a section of a bill or resolution is new, it is not underlined.]