Senate
|
05/29/2015
|
House Calendar Number 656
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/29/2015
|
Favorable Report, Tabled for the Calendar, House
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/27/2015
|
Senate Passed as Amended by Senate Amendment Schedule A
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/27/2015
|
Senate Adopted Senate Amendment Schedule A 7917
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/11/2015
|
File Number 805
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/11/2015
|
Senate Calendar Number 492
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/11/2015
|
Favorable Report, Tabled for the Calendar, Senate
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/11/2015
|
Reported Out of Legislative Commissioners' Office
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/04/2015
|
Referred to Office of Legislative Research and Office of Fiscal Analysis 05/11/15 10:00 AM
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/30/2015
|
Filed with Legislative Commissioners' Office
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/29/2015
|
Joint Favorable Substitute
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/27/2015
|
Change of Reference, House to Committee on Appropriations
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/27/2015
|
Change of Reference, Senate to Committee on Appropriations
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/25/2015
|
Change of Reference Appropriations
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/13/2015
|
Public Hearing 03/18
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/11/2015
|
Referred to Joint Committee on Public Health
|
|
|