Senate
|
06/19/2015
|
Signed by the Governor
|
|
|
Senate
|
06/11/2015
|
Transmitted by Secretary of the State to Governor
|
|
|
Senate
|
06/11/2015
|
Transmitted to the Secretary of State
|
|
|
Senate
|
06/08/2015
|
Special Act 15-7
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/28/2015
|
In Concurrence
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/28/2015
|
House Passed as Amended by Senate Amendment Schedule A
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/28/2015
|
House Adopted Senate Amendment Schedule A
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/22/2015
|
House Calendar Number 627
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/22/2015
|
Favorable Report, Tabled for the Calendar, House
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/20/2015
|
Senate Passed as Amended by Senate Amendment Schedule A
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/20/2015
|
Motion Failed
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/20/2015
|
Motion to Refer to Committee
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/20/2015
|
Senate Adopted Senate Amendment Schedule A 7752
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/21/2015
|
No New File by Committee on Planning and Development
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/21/2015
|
Favorable Report, Tabled for the Calendar, Senate
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/21/2015
|
Reported Out of Legislative Commissioners' Office
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/21/2015
|
Filed with Legislative Commissioners' Office
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/20/2015
|
Joint Favorable
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/14/2015
|
Referred by Senate to Committee on Planning and Development
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/07/2015
|
File Number 506
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/07/2015
|
Senate Calendar Number 306
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/30/2015
|
Referred to Office of Legislative Research and Office of Fiscal Analysis 04/07/15 10:00 AM
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/13/2015
|
Public Hearing 03/17
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/11/2015
|
Referred to Joint Committee on Public Safety and Security
|
|
|