House
|
07/10/2015
|
Signed by the Governor
|
|
|
House
|
06/26/2015
|
Transmitted by Secretary of the State to Governor
|
|
|
House
|
06/26/2015
|
Transmitted to the Secretary of State
|
|
|
House
|
06/17/2015
|
Public Act 15-248
|
|
|
House
|
06/03/2015
|
In Concurrence
|
|
|
House
|
06/03/2015
|
House Passed as Amended by Senate Amendment Schedule B
|
|
|
House
|
06/03/2015
|
House Adopted Senate Amendment Schedule B
|
|
|
House
|
05/30/2015
|
House Calendar Number 678
|
|
|
House
|
05/30/2015
|
Favorable Report, Tabled for the Calendar, House
|
|
|
House
|
05/30/2015
|
Rules Suspended, Transmitted to the House
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/30/2015
|
Senate Passed as Amended by Senate Amendment Schedule B
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/30/2015
|
Senate Adopted Senate Amendment Schedule B 8458
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/30/2015
|
Amendment Withdrawn, Senate Amendment Schedule A 8616
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/29/2015
|
Removed from the Foot of the Calendar, Senate
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/08/2015
|
Moved to Foot of the Calendar, Senate
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/02/2015
|
File Number 450
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/02/2015
|
Senate Calendar Number 266
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/02/2015
|
Favorable Report, Tabled for the Calendar, Senate
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/02/2015
|
Reported Out of Legislative Commissioners' Office
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/27/2015
|
Referred to Office of Legislative Research and Office of Fiscal Analysis 04/01/15 5:00 PM
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/19/2015
|
Filed with Legislative Commissioners' Office
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/19/2015
|
Joint Favorable
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/13/2015
|
Public Hearing 03/17
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/11/2015
|
Referred to Joint Committee on Higher Education and Employment Advancement
|
|
|