Senate
|
06/22/2015
|
Signed by the Governor
|
|
|
Senate
|
06/11/2015
|
Transmitted by Secretary of the State to Governor
|
|
|
Senate
|
06/11/2015
|
Transmitted to the Secretary of State
|
|
|
Senate
|
06/09/2015
|
Public Act 15-108
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/29/2015
|
In Concurrence
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/29/2015
|
House Passed as Amended by Senate Amendment Schedule A
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/29/2015
|
House Adopted Senate Amendment Schedule A
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/29/2015
|
Tabled for the Calendar, House
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/29/2015
|
No New File by Committee on Appropriations
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/29/2015
|
Joint Favorable
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/29/2015
|
Reported Out of Legislative Commissioners' Office
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/29/2015
|
Filed with Legislative Commissioners' Office
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/27/2015
|
Referred by House to Committee on Appropriations
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/22/2015
|
House Calendar Number 635
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/22/2015
|
Favorable Report, Tabled for the Calendar, House
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/21/2015
|
On Consent Calendar
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/21/2015
|
Senate Passed as Amended by Senate Amendment Schedule A
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/21/2015
|
Senate Adopted Senate Amendment Schedule A 8122
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/14/2015
|
File Number 640
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/14/2015
|
Senate Calendar Number 360
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/14/2015
|
Favorable Report, Tabled for the Calendar, Senate
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/07/2015
|
Referred to Office of Legislative Research and Office of Fiscal Analysis 04/13/15 5:00 PM
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/25/2015
|
Joint Favorable Substitute
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/13/2015
|
Public Hearing 03/19
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/12/2015
|
Referred to Joint Committee on Education
|
|
|