Senate
|
06/02/2015
|
House Calendar Number 684
|
|
|
Senate
|
06/02/2015
|
Favorable Report, Tabled for the Calendar, House
|
|
|
Senate
|
06/01/2015
|
Transmitted Pursuant To Joint Rule 17
|
|
|
Senate
|
06/01/2015
|
Senate Passed as Amended by Senate Amendment Schedule A
|
|
|
Senate
|
06/01/2015
|
Senate Adopted Senate Amendment Schedule A 9094
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/26/2015
|
No New File by Committee on Appropriations
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/26/2015
|
Favorable Report, Tabled for the Calendar, Senate
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/26/2015
|
Reported Out of Legislative Commissioners' Office
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/26/2015
|
Filed with Legislative Commissioners' Office
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/22/2015
|
Joint Favorable
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/19/2015
|
Referred by Senate to Committee on Appropriations
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/30/2015
|
No New File by Committee on Government Administration and Elections
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/22/2015
|
Referred by Senate to Committee on Government Administration and Elections
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/14/2015
|
File Number 641
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/14/2015
|
Senate Calendar Number 361
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/07/2015
|
Referred to Office of Legislative Research and Office of Fiscal Analysis 04/13/15 5:00 PM
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/25/2015
|
Joint Favorable Substitute
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/13/2015
|
Public Hearing 03/19
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/12/2015
|
Referred to Joint Committee on Education
|
|
|