Senate | 05/22/2015 | House Calendar Number 637 | ||
Senate | 05/22/2015 | Favorable Report, Tabled for the Calendar, House | ||
Senate | 05/21/2015 | On Consent Calendar | ||
Senate | 05/21/2015 | Senate Passed as Amended by Senate Amendment Schedule A | ||
Senate | 05/21/2015 | Senate Adopted Senate Amendment Schedule A 8104 | ||
Senate | 04/13/2015 | File Number 621 | ||
Senate | 04/13/2015 | Senate Calendar Number 335 | ||
Senate | 04/13/2015 | Favorable Report, Tabled for the Calendar, Senate | ||
Senate | 04/13/2015 | Reported Out of Legislative Commissioners' Office | ||
Senate | 04/06/2015 | Referred to Office of Legislative Research and Office of Fiscal Analysis 04/13/15 10:00 AM | ||
Senate | 03/27/2015 | Filed with Legislative Commissioners' Office | ||
Senate | 03/25/2015 | Joint Favorable Substitute | ||
Senate | 03/13/2015 | Public Hearing 03/19 | ||
Senate | 03/12/2015 | Referred to Joint Committee on Education |