Senate
|
05/29/2015
|
House Calendar Number 657
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/29/2015
|
Favorable Report, Tabled for the Calendar, House
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/27/2015
|
On Consent Calendar
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/27/2015
|
Senate Passed as Amended by Senate Amendment Schedule A
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/27/2015
|
Senate Adopted Senate Amendment Schedule A 8142
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/21/2015
|
No New File by Committee on Higher Education and Employment Advancement
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/21/2015
|
Favorable Report, Tabled for the Calendar, Senate
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/21/2015
|
Reported Out of Legislative Commissioners' Office
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/21/2015
|
Filed with Legislative Commissioners' Office
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/21/2015
|
Joint Favorable
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/19/2015
|
Referred by Senate to Committee on Higher Education and Employment Advancement
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/29/2015
|
No New File by Committee on Education
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/22/2015
|
Referred by Senate to Committee on Education
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/14/2015
|
File Number 643
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/14/2015
|
Senate Calendar Number 367
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/07/2015
|
Referred to Office of Legislative Research and Office of Fiscal Analysis 04/13/15 5:00 PM
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/16/2015
|
Public Hearing 03/20
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/13/2015
|
Referred to Joint Committee on Judiciary
|
|
|