Senate
|
06/19/2015
|
Signed by the Governor
|
|
|
Senate
|
06/10/2015
|
Transmitted by Secretary of the State to Governor
|
|
|
Senate
|
06/10/2015
|
Transmitted to the Secretary of State
|
|
|
Senate
|
06/02/2015
|
Special Act 15-6
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/26/2015
|
In Concurrence
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/26/2015
|
House Passed as Amended by Senate Amendment Schedule A
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/26/2015
|
House Adopted Senate Amendment Schedule A
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/08/2015
|
House Calendar Number 538
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/08/2015
|
Favorable Report, Tabled for the Calendar, House
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/07/2015
|
On Consent Calendar
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/07/2015
|
Senate Passed as Amended by Senate Amendment Schedule A
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/07/2015
|
Senate Adopted Senate Amendment Schedule A 6894
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/20/2015
|
File Number 727
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/20/2015
|
Senate Calendar Number 424
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/20/2015
|
Favorable Report, Tabled for the Calendar, Senate
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/20/2015
|
Reported Out of Legislative Commissioners' Office
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/13/2015
|
Referred to Office of Legislative Research and Office of Fiscal Analysis 04/20/15 10:00 AM
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/07/2015
|
Filed with Legislative Commissioners' Office
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/06/2015
|
Joint Favorable Substitute
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/20/2015
|
Public Hearing 03/25
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/19/2015
|
Referred to Joint Committee on Judiciary
|
|
|