Connecticut 2015 Regular Session

Connecticut Senate Bill SB01129 Compare Versions

Only one version of the bill is available at this time.
OldNewDifferences
11 General Assembly Raised Bill No. 1129
22 January Session, 2015 LCO No. 5861
33 *05861_______JUD*
44 Referred to Committee on JUDICIARY
55 Introduced by:
66 (JUD)
77
88 General Assembly
99
1010 Raised Bill No. 1129
1111
1212 January Session, 2015
1313
1414 LCO No. 5861
1515
1616 *05861_______JUD*
1717
1818 Referred to Committee on JUDICIARY
1919
2020 Introduced by:
2121
2222 (JUD)
2323
2424 AN ACT ESTABLISHING A PILOT PROGRAM TO IDENTIFY AND TRACK THE HOMELESS, ADDICTED OR MENTALLY ILL PERSONS ENTERING THE JUSTICE SYSTEM AND CONCERNING THE EARNED RISK REDUCTION CREDIT PROGRAM.
2525
2626 Be it enacted by the Senate and House of Representatives in General Assembly convened:
2727
2828 Section 1. (NEW) (Effective October 1, 2015) (a) The Chief Court Administrator shall establish a pilot program to serve the geographical area courts for New Haven, New London and Norwich in the judicial districts of New Haven and New London in identifying and tracking the homeless, addicted or mentally ill persons entering the criminal justice system.
2929
3030 (b) The office of the state's attorney for each such judicial district shall screen in order to identify and track persons arrested who are homeless, drug addicted or mentally ill for intensive assistance, and shall refer such persons to diversion programs, counseling, treatment, housing assistance and reentry programs in an effort to stabilize such person and prevent future arrests of such person, provided the office retains the discretion to dispose of any case in any manner, with a focus on alternatives to incarceration and that the court shall maintain jurisdiction over the cases to ensure compliance with any ordered treatment or counseling.
3131
3232 (c) The Chief Court Administrator shall establish policies and procedures to implement the pilot program required by this section and, on or before February 1, 2017, shall submit a report to the joint standing committee of the General Assembly having cognizance of matters relating to judiciary, in accordance with section 11-4a of the general statutes, concerning the implementation of the pilot program.
3333
3434 Sec. 2. Section 18-98e of the general statutes is repealed and the following is substituted in lieu thereof (Effective October 1, 2015):
3535
3636 (a) Notwithstanding any provision of the general statutes, any person sentenced to a term of imprisonment for a crime committed on or after October 1, 1994, and committed to the custody of the Commissioner of Correction on or after said date, except a person sentenced for a violation of section 53a-54a, 53a-54b, 53a-54c, 53a-54d, 53a-55, 53a-55a, 53a-59c, 53a-70a, 53a-70c or 53a-100aa, or is a persistent dangerous felony offender or persistent dangerous sexual offender pursuant to section 53a-40, may be eligible to earn risk reduction credit toward a reduction of such person's sentence, in an amount not to exceed five days per month, at the discretion of the Commissioner of Correction for conduct as provided in subsection (b) of this section occurring on or after April 1, 2006.
3737
3838 (b) An inmate may earn risk reduction credit for adherence to the inmate's offender accountability plan, for participation in eligible programs and activities, and for good conduct and obedience to institutional rules as designated by the commissioner, provided (1) good conduct and obedience to institutional rules alone shall not entitle an inmate to such credit, and (2) the commissioner or the commissioner's designee may, in his or her discretion, cause the loss of all or any portion of such earned risk reduction credit for any act of misconduct or insubordination or refusal to conform to recommended programs or activities or institutional rules occurring at any time during the service of the sentence or for other good cause. If an inmate has not earned sufficient risk reduction credit at the time the commissioner or the commissioner's designee orders the loss of all or a portion of earned credit, such loss shall be deducted from any credit earned by such inmate in the future.
3939
4040 (c) The award of risk reduction credit earned for conduct occurring prior to July 1, 2011, shall be phased in consistent with public safety, risk reduction, administrative purposes and sound correctional practice, at the discretion of the commissioner, but shall be completed not later than July 1, 2012.
4141
4242 (d) Any credit earned under this section may only be earned during the period of time that the inmate is sentenced to a term of imprisonment and committed to the custody of the commissioner and may not be transferred or applied to a subsequent term of imprisonment. In no event shall any credit earned under this section be applied by the commissioner so as to reduce a mandatory minimum term of imprisonment such inmate is required to serve by statute.
4343
4444 (e) Prior to release of any inmate whose sentence is being reduced due to risk reduction credits earned pursuant to this section, the warden of the correctional facility from which such inmate is to be released, shall review such inmate's records and verify that the inmate earned the risk reduction credits being applied to reduce such inmate's sentence.
4545
4646 [(e)] (f) The commissioner shall adopt policies and procedures to determine the amount of credit an inmate may earn toward a reduction in his or her sentence and to phase in the awarding of retroactive credit authorized by subsection (c) of this section.
4747
4848
4949
5050
5151 This act shall take effect as follows and shall amend the following sections:
5252 Section 1 October 1, 2015 New section
5353 Sec. 2 October 1, 2015 18-98e
5454
5555 This act shall take effect as follows and shall amend the following sections:
5656
5757 Section 1
5858
5959 October 1, 2015
6060
6161 New section
6262
6363 Sec. 2
6464
6565 October 1, 2015
6666
6767 18-98e
6868
6969 Statement of Purpose:
7070
7171 To create a pilot program to identify and track the homeless, addicted or mentally ill persons entering the criminal justice system, with the intention of referring them to treatment and assistance as an alternative to incarceration and to reduce recidivism and to add to the list of crimes for which an inmate is sentenced and becomes ineligible to earn risk reduction credits and to require the warden to review and verify an inmate's record, if risk reduction credits are being applied to reduce such inmate's sentence.
7272
7373 [Proposed deletions are enclosed in brackets. Proposed additions are indicated by underline, except that when the entire text of a bill or resolution or a section of a bill or resolution is new, it is not underlined.]