Senate | 06/02/2015 | House Calendar Number 682 | ||
Senate | 06/02/2015 | Favorable Report, Tabled for the Calendar, House | ||
Senate | 06/01/2015 | Transmitted Pursuant To Joint Rule 17 | ||
Senate | 06/01/2015 | On Consent Calendar | ||
Senate | 06/01/2015 | Senate Passed as Amended by Senate Amendment Schedule A | ||
Senate | 06/01/2015 | Senate Adopted Senate Amendment Schedule A 8948 | ||
Senate | 05/07/2015 | File Number 782 | ||
Senate | 05/07/2015 | Senate Calendar Number 459 | ||
Senate | 05/07/2015 | Favorable Report, Tabled for the Calendar, Senate | ||
Senate | 05/07/2015 | Reported Out of Legislative Commissioners' Office | ||
Senate | 05/01/2015 | Referred to Office of Legislative Research and Office of Fiscal Analysis 05/06/15 5:00 PM | ||
Senate | 04/24/2015 | Filed with Legislative Commissioners' Office | ||
Senate | 04/24/2015 | Joint Favorable Substitute | ||
Senate | 04/15/2015 | Public Hearing 04/20 | ||
Senate | 04/09/2015 | Referred to Joint Committee on Finance, Revenue and Bonding |