House | 04/25/2016 | File Number 711 | ||
House | 04/25/2016 | House Calendar Number 489 | ||
House | 04/25/2016 | Favorable Report, Tabled for the Calendar, House | ||
House | 04/25/2016 | Reported Out of Legislative Commissioners' Office | ||
House | 04/18/2016 | Referred to Office of Legislative Research and Office of Fiscal Analysis 04/25/16 10:00 AM | ||
House | 04/08/2016 | Filed with Legislative Commissioners' Office | ||
House | 04/07/2016 | Joint Favorable Substitute | ||
House | 02/22/2016 | Public Hearing 02/26 | ||
House | 02/04/2016 | Referred to Joint Committee on Finance, Revenue and Bonding |