House
|
06/06/2016
|
Signed by the Governor
|
|
|
House
|
05/25/2016
|
Transmitted by Secretary of the State to Governor
|
|
|
House
|
05/25/2016
|
Transmitted to the Secretary of State
|
|
|
House
|
05/19/2016
|
Public Act 16-120
|
|
|
House
|
05/04/2016
|
In Concurrence
|
|
|
House
|
05/04/2016
|
Senate Passed as Amended by House Amendment Schedule A
|
|
|
House
|
05/04/2016
|
Senate Adopted House Amendment Schedule A
|
|
|
House
|
04/30/2016
|
Senate Calendar Number 574
|
|
|
House
|
04/30/2016
|
Favorable Report, Tabled for the Calendar, Senate
|
|
|
House
|
04/30/2016
|
Transmitted Pursuant To Joint Rule 17
|
|
|
House
|
04/30/2016
|
House Passed as Amended by House Amendment Schedule A
|
|
|
House
|
04/30/2016
|
House Adopted House Amendment Schedule A 5047
|
|
|
House
|
03/29/2016
|
File Number 224
|
|
|
House
|
03/29/2016
|
House Calendar Number 167
|
|
|
House
|
03/29/2016
|
Favorable Report, Tabled for the Calendar, House
|
|
|
House
|
03/29/2016
|
Reported Out of Legislative Commissioners' Office
|
|
|
House
|
03/21/2016
|
Referred to Office of Legislative Research and Office of Fiscal Analysis 03/29/16 10:00 AM
|
|
|
House
|
03/15/2016
|
Filed with Legislative Commissioners' Office
|
|
|
House
|
03/15/2016
|
Joint Favorable
|
|
|
House
|
02/11/2016
|
Public Hearing 02/18
|
|
|
House
|
02/05/2016
|
Referred to Joint Committee on Higher Education and Employment Advancement
|
|
|