House
|
05/26/2016
|
Signed by the Governor
|
|
|
House
|
05/16/2016
|
Transmitted by Secretary of the State to Governor
|
|
|
House
|
05/16/2016
|
Transmitted to the Secretary of State
|
|
|
House
|
05/10/2016
|
Public Act 16-44
|
|
|
House
|
05/03/2016
|
On Consent Calendar / In Concurrence
|
|
|
House
|
05/03/2016
|
Senate Passed as Amended by House Amendment Schedule A
|
|
|
House
|
05/03/2016
|
Senate Adopted House Amendment Schedule A
|
|
|
House
|
04/22/2016
|
File Number 702
|
|
|
House
|
04/22/2016
|
Senate Calendar Number 477
|
|
|
House
|
04/22/2016
|
Favorable Report, Tabled for the Calendar, Senate
|
|
|
House
|
04/20/2016
|
House Passed as Amended by House Amendment Schedule A
|
|
|
House
|
04/20/2016
|
House Adopted House Amendment Schedule A 3990
|
|
|
House
|
03/21/2016
|
File Number 57
|
|
|
House
|
03/21/2016
|
House Calendar Number 74
|
|
|
House
|
03/21/2016
|
Favorable Report, Tabled for the Calendar, House
|
|
|
House
|
03/21/2016
|
Reported Out of Legislative Commissioners' Office
|
|
|
House
|
03/14/2016
|
Referred to Office of Legislative Research and Office of Fiscal Analysis 03/21/16 10:00 AM
|
|
|
House
|
03/04/2016
|
Filed with Legislative Commissioners' Office
|
|
|
House
|
03/03/2016
|
Joint Favorable
|
|
|
House
|
02/25/2016
|
Vote to Hold Until Next Meeting
|
|
|
House
|
02/11/2016
|
Public Hearing 02/18
|
|
|
House
|
02/05/2016
|
Referred to Joint Committee on Higher Education and Employment Advancement
|
|
|