House | 03/03/2016 | File Number 2 | ||
House | 03/03/2016 | House Calendar Number 38 | ||
House | 03/03/2016 | Favorable Report, Tabled for the Calendar, House | ||
House | 03/03/2016 | Reported Out of Legislative Commissioners' Office | ||
House | 02/26/2016 | Referred to Office of Legislative Research and Office of Fiscal Analysis 03/02/16 5:00 PM | ||
House | 02/23/2016 | Filed with Legislative Commissioners' Office | ||
House | 02/23/2016 | Joint Favorable | ||
House | 02/11/2016 | Public Hearing 02/16 | ||
House | 02/05/2016 | Referred to Joint Committee on Labor and Public Employees |