House | 04/22/2016 | Tabled for the Calendar, House | ||
House | 04/22/2016 | No New File by Committee on Planning and Development | ||
House | 04/22/2016 | Reported Out of Legislative Commissioners' Office | ||
House | 04/22/2016 | Filed with Legislative Commissioners' Office | ||
House | 04/22/2016 | Joint Favorable | ||
House | 04/20/2016 | Referred by House to Committee on Planning and Development | ||
House | 03/10/2016 | File Number 19 | ||
House | 03/10/2016 | House Calendar Number 51 | ||
House | 03/10/2016 | Favorable Report, Tabled for the Calendar, House | ||
House | 03/04/2016 | Referred to Office of Legislative Research and Office of Fiscal Analysis 03/09/16 5:00 PM | ||
House | 02/11/2016 | Public Hearing 02/16 | ||
House | 02/10/2016 | Referred to Joint Committee on Children |