House | 04/06/2016 | Tabled for the Calendar, House | ||
House | 04/06/2016 | No New File by Committee on Judiciary | ||
House | 04/06/2016 | Reported Out of Legislative Commissioners' Office | ||
House | 04/06/2016 | Filed with Legislative Commissioners' Office | ||
House | 04/06/2016 | Joint Favorable | ||
House | 03/31/2016 | Referred by House to Committee on Judiciary | ||
House | 03/22/2016 | File Number 104 | ||
House | 03/22/2016 | House Calendar Number 98 | ||
House | 03/22/2016 | Favorable Report, Tabled for the Calendar, House | ||
House | 03/16/2016 | Referred to Office of Legislative Research and Office of Fiscal Analysis 03/21/16 5:00 PM | ||
House | 02/11/2016 | Public Hearing 02/16 | ||
House | 02/10/2016 | Referred to Joint Committee on Children |