House
|
06/01/2016
|
Signed by the Governor
|
|
|
House
|
05/18/2016
|
Transmitted by Secretary of the State to Governor
|
|
|
House
|
05/18/2016
|
Transmitted to the Secretary of State
|
|
|
House
|
05/16/2016
|
Public Act 16-96
|
|
|
House
|
05/04/2016
|
On Consent Calendar / In Concurrence
|
|
|
House
|
05/04/2016
|
Senate Passed
|
|
|
House
|
04/30/2016
|
Senate Calendar Number 578
|
|
|
House
|
04/30/2016
|
Favorable Report, Tabled for the Calendar, Senate
|
|
|
House
|
04/30/2016
|
Transmitted Pursuant To Joint Rule 17
|
|
|
House
|
04/30/2016
|
House Passed
|
|
|
House
|
04/06/2016
|
Tabled for the Calendar, House
|
|
|
House
|
04/06/2016
|
No New File by Committee on Judiciary
|
|
|
House
|
04/06/2016
|
Joint Favorable
|
|
|
House
|
04/06/2016
|
Reported Out of Legislative Commissioners' Office
|
|
|
House
|
04/06/2016
|
Filed with Legislative Commissioners' Office
|
|
|
House
|
03/31/2016
|
Referred by House to Committee on Judiciary
|
|
|
House
|
03/09/2016
|
File Number 11
|
|
|
House
|
03/09/2016
|
House Calendar Number 49
|
|
|
House
|
03/09/2016
|
Favorable Report, Tabled for the Calendar, House
|
|
|
House
|
03/03/2016
|
Referred to Office of Legislative Research and Office of Fiscal Analysis 03/08/16 5:00 PM
|
|
|
House
|
02/24/2016
|
Joint Favorable Substitute
|
|
|
House
|
02/11/2016
|
Public Hearing 02/19
|
|
|
House
|
02/10/2016
|
Referred to Joint Committee on Environment
|
|
|