House | 04/14/2016 | File Number 643 | ||
House | 04/14/2016 | Senate Calendar Number 380 | ||
House | 04/14/2016 | Favorable Report, Tabled for the Calendar, Senate | ||
House | 04/12/2016 | House Passed as Amended by House Amendment Schedule A | ||
House | 04/12/2016 | House Adopted House Amendment Schedule A 3788 | ||
House | 03/10/2016 | File Number 22 | ||
House | 03/10/2016 | House Calendar Number 54 | ||
House | 03/10/2016 | Favorable Report, Tabled for the Calendar, House | ||
House | 03/10/2016 | Reported Out of Legislative Commissioners' Office | ||
House | 03/04/2016 | Referred to Office of Legislative Research and Office of Fiscal Analysis 03/09/16 5:00 PM | ||
House | 02/25/2016 | Filed with Legislative Commissioners' Office | ||
House | 02/24/2016 | Joint Favorable | ||
House | 02/11/2016 | Public Hearing 02/19 | ||
House | 02/10/2016 | Referred to Joint Committee on Environment |